NH SB113 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-01 - Signed by the Governor on 07/28/2023; Chapter 0162; Effective 09/26/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-01 - Signed by the Governor on 07/28/2023; Chapter 0162; Effective 09/26/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the electric utility system benefits charge.
Title
Relative to the electric utility system benefits charge.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Denise Ricciardi [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Daniel Innis [R] |
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/28/2023; Chapter 0162; Effective 09/26/2023 |
2023-06-30 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 House Journal 17 P. 16 |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/29/2023); Senate Journal 20 |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Sen. Avard Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/01/2023; Senate Journal 16 |
2023-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1399h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2023 House Journal 13 P. 17 |
2023-05-04 | House | Amendment # 2023-1399h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2023 House Journal 13 P. 17 |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1399h (NT) 04/18/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2023-04-11 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/17/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-04-11 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-03-28 | House | Public Hearing: 04/10/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-03-20 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/09/2023; Senate Journal 6 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/09/2023; Senate Calendar 9 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2023, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |