NH SB113 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
Pending: Senate Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to municipal authority regarding the state building code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to municipal authority regarding the state building code.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-02-20SenateHearing: 03/13/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback