NH SB113 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 9, Pg.112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 9, Pg.112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to nonpublic schools receiving public funds.
Title
Relative to nonpublic schools receiving public funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 9, Pg.112 | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 3/16/11; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Hearing: 2/15/11, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 10 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Education, Senate Journal 3, Pg.36 |