NH SB112 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Signed by the Governor on 07/15/2013; Chapter 0231; Effective 09/13/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Signed by the Governor on 07/15/2013; Chapter 0231; Effective 09/13/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to voters guides for proposed constitutional amendments.
Title
Relative to voters guides for proposed constitutional amendments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/15/2013; Chapter 0231; Effective 09/13/2013 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1711 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Precott Moved Concur with House Amendment #1408h, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1408h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1567 |
2013-06-05 | House | Amendment #1408h(NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1567 |
2013-05-28 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-1408h (New Title); House Calendar42, PG.1451-1452 |
2013-05-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1408h(NT) for June 5 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar42, PG.1427 |
2013-05-14 | House | Executive Session: 5/28/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-04-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/30/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-04-19 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/24/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-04-09 | House | Public Hearing: 4/16/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 31, PG.1074 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/14/13; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 2/6/13, Room 100, State House, 2:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Rules, Enrolled Bills and Internal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |