NH SB111 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB111
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to claims for medical monitoring.
Title
Relative to claims for medical monitoring.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 04/01/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 03/16/2021, 01:20 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 3 |
Same As/Similar To
SB111 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10