NH SB11 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - II. Remainder Effective 05/21/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to mental health services and making appropriations therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to mental health services and making appropriations therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Rereferred (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment 0213s (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateII. Remainder Effective 05/21/2019
2019-05-21SenateI. Section 6 Effective 07/01/2019
2019-05-21SenateSigned by the Governor on 05/21/2019; Chapter 0041
2019-05-14HouseEnrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 100
2019-05-02HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 15
2019-05-10SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/02/2019); Senate Journal 16
2019-04-11HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/02/2019 (Vote 19-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 9
2019-04-03House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/09/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-03-27HouseDivision I Subcommittee Work Session: 04/02/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-03-20House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/26/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-03-20HousePublic Hearing: 03/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-03-11HouseIntroduced 03/07/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 8 P. 61
2019-02-21SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0572s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6
2019-02-21SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0572s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6
2019-02-19SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0572s, 02/21/2019; Senate Calendar 11A
2019-01-31SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0088s, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 01/31/2019; Senate Journal 4
2019-01-31SenateSen. Giuda Moved to Rerefer, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Motion Failed; 01/31/2019; Senate Journal 4
2019-01-31SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2019-0213s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 01/31/2019; Senate Journal 4
2019-01-31SenateWithout Objection, Sen. D'Allesandro Moved the Question, Motion Adopted; 01/31/2019; Senate Journal 4
2019-01-31SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0088s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/31/2019; Senate Journal 4
2019-01-23SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0088s, 01/31/2019; Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-17SenateHearing: 01/22/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 7
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=1053&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB11
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=1000&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1000
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA2&id=1000
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&v=HP&id=1000
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=5&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0011&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB11&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1053
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=6&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0011&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB11&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1053
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=7&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0011&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB11&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1053
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=26&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0011&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB11&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1053

Bill Comments

feedback