NH SB11 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - Reconsider Indefinite Postponement of SB 11 (Rep. Shurtleff): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 183-194 02/16/2017 House Journal 8 P. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting collective bargaining agreements that require employees to join or contribute to a labor union.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting collective bargaining agreements that require employees to join or contribute to a labor union.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-16 - House - Reconsider (Y: 183 N: 194 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - House - Indefinitely Postpone (Y: 193 N: 184 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - ITL (Y: 200 N: 177 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-16HouseReconsider Indefinite Postponement of SB 11 (Rep. Shurtleff): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 183-194 02/16/2017 House Journal 8 P. 23
2017-02-16HouseIndefinitely Postpone (Rep. Morrison): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 193-184 02/16/2017 House Journal 8 P. 21
2017-02-16HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 200-177 02/16/2017 House Journal 8 P. 18
2017-02-16HouseSpecial Order to 2/16/2017 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 57
2017-02-10HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2017-02-10HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/15/2017 (Vote 14-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 27
2017-02-10HouseExecutive Session: 02/09/2017 Legislative Office Building 307
2017-01-25HousePublic Hearing: 02/08/2017 10:00 am Representatives Hall
2017-01-23HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 3 P. 21
2017-01-19SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 12Y-11N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 01/19/2017; Senate Journal 4
2017-01-12SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/19/2017; Senate Calendar 6
2017-01-05SenateHearing: 01/10/2017, Representatives' Hall, State House, 01:00 pm Senate Calendar 5
2017-01-03SenateTo Be Introduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=133&sy=2017&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB11
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2017&id=141&txtFormat=html
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=1&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=SB0011&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB11&ddlsponsors=&lsr=133
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=41&sy=2017&lb=H&eb=SB0011&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB11&ddlsponsors=&lsr=133
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=42&sy=2017&lb=H&eb=SB0011&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB11&ddlsponsors=&lsr=133
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=43&sy=2017&lb=H&eb=SB0011&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB11&ddlsponsors=&lsr=133

Bill Comments

feedback