NH SB105 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by the Governor on 06/06/2013; Chapter 0065; Effective 01/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by the Governor on 06/06/2013; Chapter 0065; Effective 01/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to disclosure of expert testimony in civil cases and relative to the recording of depositions.
Title
Relative to disclosure of expert testimony in civil cases and relative to the recording of depositions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/06/2013; Chapter 0065; Effective 01/01/2014 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled (05/02/13) |
2013-05-08 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG.1424 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-1410e Adopted |
2013-04-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #1410e Adopted; House Journal 38, PG.1257 |
2013-04-24 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.1242 |
2013-04-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 24 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar33, PG.1094 |
2013-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 4/16/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 4/11/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 31, PG.1074 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0744s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0744s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Without Objection Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment 0744s, New Title, Without Objection, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Chair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Sen. Bragdon Moved to Remove SB 105 from the Consent Calendar; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0744s, New Title, 3/14/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 2/12/13, Room 100, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4 |