NH SB103 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limiting food and beverage advertising and marketing on school property.
Title
Limiting food and beverage advertising and marketing on school property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 17 |
2017-04-26 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2017-04-26 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 05/04/2017 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 7 |
2017-04-26 | House | Executive Session: 04/26/2017 Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-03-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/28/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-03-07 | House | Public Hearing: 03/15/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced 02/16/2017 and referred to Education House Journal 8 P. 45 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/23/2017; Senate Calendar 11 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2017, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 5 |