NH SB1 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Enrolled 04/04/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to family and medical leave.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to family and medical leave.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Senate - OTP (Y: 219 N: 142 NV: 6 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment 0508s (Y: 10 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment 0508s (Y: 9 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseEnrolled 04/04/2019
2019-04-04SenateEnrolled (In recess 03/28/2019); Senate Journal 12
2019-03-29SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1367e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 03/28/2019); Senate Journal 12
2019-03-28HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1367e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/20/2019
2019-03-20HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 219-142 03/20/2019
2019-03-07HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-03-07HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 28
2019-02-26HouseExecutive Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-02-21HousePublic Hearing: 02/26/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
2019-02-20HouseIntroduced 02/14/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 5 P. 80
2019-02-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0321s, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateWithout Objection, Sen. Birdsell Moved the Question, Motion Adopted; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2019-0508s, Regular Calendar 10Y-13N, Amendment Failed; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateSen. Feltes Moved Reconsideration on Floor Amendment 2019-0508s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2019-0508s, Regular Calendar 9Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0321s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0321s, 02/14/2019; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-24SenateHearing: 01/29/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=1052&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB1
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=999&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=999
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&v=HP&id=999
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=19&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0001&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB1&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1052
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=20&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0001&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB1&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1052
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=21&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0001&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB1&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1052
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=129&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0001&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB1&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1052

Bill Comments

feedback