NH HR9 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-23 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 176-169 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-23 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 176-169 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Calling for the federal government to enact an American Marshall Plan to rebuild economically impoverished communities and strengthen climate resilience infrastructure.
Title
Calling for the federal government to enact an American Marshall Plan to rebuild economically impoverished communities and strengthen climate resilience infrastructure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 176-169 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 29 |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HR9 02/03/2023 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 26 |
2023-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/03/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/27/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs |