NH HR8 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0097h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0097h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting an investigation on whether opioids, benzodiazepines, and exposure to chemical agents contribute to suicides by veterans.
Title
Requesting an investigation on whether opioids, benzodiazepines, and exposure to chemical agents contribute to suicides by veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0097h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 18 |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment # 2021-0097h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 18 |
2021-02-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0097h (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 13 |
2021-02-03 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93009507127 |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2021 02:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95866113093 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time thecommittee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 2 P. 50 |