NH HR8 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 255-71; House Journal 16, PG. 330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 255-71; House Journal 16, PG. 330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 50th anniversary of the Social Security Act of 1965.
Title
Commemorating the 50th anniversary of the Social Security Act of 1965.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 255-71; House Journal 16, PG. 330 |
2015-02-11 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Horrigan); House Journal 16, PG. 298 |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 11 (Vote 9-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar11, PG. 175 |
2015-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 2/4/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 1/29/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Legislative Administration; House Journal 12, PG. 220 |