NH HR8 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - House Committee Report Statements be Amended for Permanent Journal (Rep Pierce): Motion Failed Division Vote 79-234; House Journal 21, PG.506
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - House Committee Report Statements be Amended for Permanent Journal (Rep Pierce): Motion Failed Division Vote 79-234; House Journal 21, PG.506
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging the New Hampshire congressional delegation to sponsor and support a constitutional amendment to re-establish the authority of the states and Congress to regulate campaign spending by corporations.
Title
Urging the New Hampshire congressional delegation to sponsor and support a constitutional amendment to re-establish the authority of the states and Congress to regulate campaign spending by corporations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | House Committee Report Statements be Amended for Permanent Journal (Rep Pierce): Motion Failed Division Vote 79-234; House Journal 21, PG.506 | |
2011-02-23 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.506 | |
2011-02-16 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 15, PG.280-281 | |
2011-02-16 | House Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 23 (Vote 8-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 15, PG.280-281 | |
2011-02-09 | House Executive Session: 2/15/2011 Legislative Office Building 203 3:00 PM or Immediately Following House Session | |
2011-02-01 | House Public Hearing: 2/10/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2011-01-25 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs; House Journal 11, PG. 195 |