NH HR6 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Laid on Table (Rep Bartlett): Motion Adopted Division Vote 239-111; House Journal 27, PG.876
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Laid on Table (Rep Bartlett): Motion Adopted Division Vote 239-111; House Journal 27, PG.876
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 40th anniversary of the Roe v Wade Supreme Court decision and affirming support for its holding and principles.
Title
Commemorating the 40th anniversary of the Roe v Wade Supreme Court decision and affirming support for its holding and principles.
Sponsors
Rep. Candace Bouchard [D] | Rep. Laurie Harding [D] | Rep. David Kidder [R] | Rep. Priscilla Lockwood [R] |
Rep. Tara Sad [D] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Rep. Robert Theberge [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | House | Laid on Table (Rep Bartlett): Motion Adopted Division Vote 239-111; House Journal 27, PG.876 |
2013-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation for Mar 20, Part II Regular Calendar; House Calendar 23 PG.593 |
2013-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 2/14/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.201 |