NH HR21 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-15 - House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 206-97; House Journal 26, PG.1631-1633
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-15 - House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 206-97; House Journal 26, PG.1631-1633
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Congress of the United States of America to reaffirm its adherence to the Constitution of the United States regarding international agreements and treaties.
Title
Requiring the Congress of the United States of America to reaffirm its adherence to the Constitution of the United States regarding international agreements and treaties.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Vita [R] | Rep. Lucien Vita [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-15 - House - OTP (Y: 206 N: 97 NV: 42 Abs: 52) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 206-97; House Journal 26, PG.1631-1633 | |
2012-02-16 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 19, PG.1140 | |
2012-02-16 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 7 (Vote 10-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 19, PG.1140 | |
2012-02-07 | House Executive Session: 2/16/2012 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2012-01-25 | House Public Hearing: 2/2/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2011-10-24 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs; House Journal 7, PG.366 |