NH HR20 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Affirming states' powers based on the Constitution for the United States and the Constitution of New Hampshire.
Title
Affirming states' powers based on the Constitution for the United States and the Constitution of New Hampshire.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 21 |
2018-03-16 | House | Suspend House Rule 65; extending deadline for action to 3/22/2018 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 69 |
2018-03-08 | House | Special Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49 |
2018-03-08 | House | Suspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125 |
2018-03-06 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Hoell) 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 4 |
2018-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 16-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 31 |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/14/2018 Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-01-30 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/14/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 1 P. 25 |