NH HJR5 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Returned to the House, Pursuant to Rule 3-26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Returned to the House, Pursuant to Rule 3-26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
That the New Hampshire house of representatives and senate reject hate, bigotry, and violence in all their forms.
Title
That the New Hampshire house of representatives and senate reject hate, bigotry, and violence in all their forms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Returned to the House, Pursuant to Rule 3-26 |
2018-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 9 |
2018-01-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/07/2018 (Vote 9-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 12 |
2018-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 01/11/2018 Legislative Office Building 104 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 1 P. 25 |