NH HJR4 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging Congress to apply laws equally to United States citizens and members of Congress.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging Congress to apply laws equally to United States citizens and members of Congress.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 112
2018-02-20HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 14-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 48
2018-02-14HouseExecutive Session: 02/14/2018 Legislative Office Building 206
2018-01-30HouseFull Committee Work Session: 02/14/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/24/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206
2017-11-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 1 P. 25

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback