NH HCR7 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Applying to the United States Congress to convene a limited convention for the exclusive purpose of proposing amendments to the federal Constitution concerning election reform that do not abrogate or amend the First Amendment to the federal Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Applying to the United States Congress to convene a limited convention for the exclusive purpose of proposing amendments to the federal Constitution concerning election reform that do not abrogate or amend the First Amendment to the federal Constitution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-09 - House - Table (Y: 210 N: 133 NV: 30 Abs: 22) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-30HouseDied on Table
2017-03-09HouseLay on Table (Rep. Baldasaro): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 210-133 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 50
2017-02-15HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2017-02-15HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar)
2017-02-01HouseExecutive Session: 02/08/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2017-01-18HousePublic Hearing: 01/25/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 3 P. 14

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback