NH HCR7 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.361
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.361
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to expedite the entry of political dissidents from Iraq and Afghanistan to the United States.
Title
Urging Congress to expedite the entry of political dissidents from Iraq and Afghanistan to the United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-15 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.361 | |
2011-02-10 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 15 (Vote 10-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 13, PG.233 | |
2011-02-03 | House Continued Public Hearing: 2/10/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 ==Executive Session to Follow== | |
2011-01-25 | House Public Hearing: 2/3/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 ==RECESSED== | |
2011-01-19 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs; House Journal 11, PG.178 |