NH HCR6 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 569
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 569
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Petitioning Congress for an Article V amendment convention.
Title
Petitioning Congress for an Article V amendment convention.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 569 |
2015-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 4 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 353 |
2015-02-17 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2015 10:00 Amendment or one hour after House Session ends Legislative Office Building 303 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2015-02-04 | House | Vacated from Legislative Administration and Referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs; House Journal 14, PG. 273 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Legislative Administration; House Journal 12, PG. 227 |