NH HCR5 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Applying for a convention of the states under Article V of the Constitution of the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Applying for a convention of the states under Article V of the Constitution of the United States.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-30HouseDied on Table
2017-03-09HouseLay on Table (Rep. Baldasaro): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 49
2017-02-22HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2017-02-22HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 10-7; Regular Calendar)
2017-02-08HouseExecutive Session: 02/22/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2017-02-01HousePublic Hearing: 02/08/2017 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 206
2017-01-06HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 3 P. 9

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback