NH HCR5 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-09 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.312
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-09 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.312
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging that the United Kingdom return the Parthenon (Elgin) marbles to Greece.
Title
Urging that the United Kingdom return the Parthenon (Elgin) marbles to Greece.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.312 | |
2011-02-01 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 9 (Vote 12-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 12, PG.203 | |
2011-01-26 | House Executive Session: 2/1/2011 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 | |
2011-01-13 | House Public Hearing: 1/18/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 | |
2011-01-07 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Legislative Administration; House Journal 11, PG. 172 |