NH HCR4 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-20 - Public Hearing: 01/29/2021 11:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95866113093 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time thecommittee is initially convened.
Pending: House State-federal Relations and Veterans Affairs Committee
Hearing: Jan 29 @ 11:30 am in Members of the public may attend using the following link:To joi
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing the authority of states to enact laws protecting the lives of the unborn and calling for a Constitutional Convention to propose a human life amendment to the Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing the authority of states to enact laws protecting the lives of the unborn and calling for a Constitutional Convention to propose a human life amendment to the Constitution.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-20HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2021 11:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95866113093 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time thecommittee is initially convened.
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback