NH HCR4 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-17 - Returned to the House, Pursuant to Rule 3-26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-17 - Returned to the House, Pursuant to Rule 3-26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging media outlets not to broadcast the name or image of a suspected perpetrator of a mass shooting.
Title
Encouraging media outlets not to broadcast the name or image of a suspected perpetrator of a mass shooting.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Hopper [R] | Rep. David Love [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Richard Hinch [R] |
Rep. Timothy Horrigan [D] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-17 | Senate | Returned to the House, Pursuant to Rule 3-26 |
2019-01-31 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 5 |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/31/2019 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 5 |
2019-01-11 | House | Executive Session: 01/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-12-31 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 2 P. 47 |