NH HCR3 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-09 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-09 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declaring that the Claremont case's mandates that the legislative and executive branches define an adequate education, determine its cost, fund its entire cost with state taxes, and ensure its delivery through accountability, are not binding on the legislative and executive branches.
Title
Declaring that the Claremont case's mandates that the legislative and executive branches define an adequate education, determine its cost, fund its entire cost with state taxes, and ensure its delivery through accountability, are not binding on the legislative and executive branches.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-03-09 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 77 |
2021-03-02 | House | Executive Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95501229688 |
2021-02-19 | House | Public Hearing: 02/19/2021 02:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92168223794 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 50 |