NH HCR3 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0577h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 251-56 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 119
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to welcoming communities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to welcoming communities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - OTPA (Y: 251 N: 57 NV: 58 Abs: 34) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0577h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 251-56 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 119
2019-03-19HouseAmendment # 2019-0577h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 119
2019-03-07HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0577h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 15-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 27
2019-02-26House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/05/2019 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2019-02-13House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/19/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306
2019-02-05HousePublic Hearing: 02/12/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2018-12-31HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 46

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback