NH HCR3 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Rescinding all applications by the New Hampshire legislature for a federal constitutional convention and urging other states to withdraw similar requests.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rescinding all applications by the New Hampshire legislature for a federal constitutional convention and urging other states to withdraw similar requests.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-30HouseDied on Table
2017-02-09HouseLay on Table (Rep. Hinch): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 23
2017-01-30HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2017-01-30HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/09/2017 (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 12
2017-01-18HouseExecutive Session: 01/25/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2017-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/19/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2016-12-29HouseIntroduced 01/04/2017 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 2 P. 23

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback