NH HCR3 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Applying to Congress to call a convention of states under the United States Constitution.
Title
Applying to Congress to call a convention of states under the United States Constitution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-18 | House | Died on the Table |
2015-03-12 | House | Remove from Table (Rep Edelblut): Motion Failed DV 71-228; House Journal 26, PG. 1204 |
2015-03-04 | House | Lay on Table (Rep Baldasaro): Motion Adopted DV 205-101; House Journal 22, PG. 624 |
2015-03-04 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Horrigan); House Journal 22, PG. 559 |
2015-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0423h for Mar 4 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 353 |
2015-02-17 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2015 10:00 Amendment or one hour after House Session ends Legislative Office Building 303 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/13/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-02-04 | House | Vacated from Legislative Administration and Referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs; House Journal 14, PG. 273 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Legislative Administration; House Journal 12, PG. 220 |