NH HCR3 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-09 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.333
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-09 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.333
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging increased consideration and preservation of local authority in international trade and investment agreements.
Title
Urging increased consideration and preservation of local authority in international trade and investment agreements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.333 | |
2011-02-09 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Weed); House Journal 16, PG.309 | |
2011-01-27 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 9 (Vote 10-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 10, PG.148 | |
2011-01-25 | House Executive Session: 1/27/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2011-01-11 | House Public Hearing: 1/20/2011 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2011-01-03 | House Introduced 1/5/2011 and Referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs; House Journal 8, PG.131 |