NH HCR2 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR2
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-06 - Full Committee Work Session: 10/19/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307
Pending: House Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-06 - Full Committee Work Session: 10/19/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307
Pending: House Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Terminating the state of emergency declared by the governor due to the Novel Coronavirus (COVID-19).
Title
Terminating the state of emergency declared by the governor due to the Novel Coronavirus (COVID-19).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-06 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/19/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2021-03-30 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Executive Session: 03/29/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96696519759 |
2021-03-09 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/09/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97592045901 |
2021-03-01 | House | Public Hearing: 03/01/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95526791336 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 2 P. 46 |
Same As/Similar To
HCR2 (Carry Over) 2021-10-06 - Full Committee Work Session: 10/19/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307