NH HCR2 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Not Introduced (Rule 3-26)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Not Introduced (Rule 3-26)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Congress to begin the process for a constitutional amendment establishing that human beings, not corporations, are entitled to constitutional rights.
Title
Requesting Congress to begin the process for a constitutional amendment establishing that human beings, not corporations, are entitled to constitutional rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-20 - House - OTP (Y: 189 N: 139 NV: 69 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - House - INDEFINITELY POSTPONE (REP HOELL) (Y: 151 N: 187 NV: 59 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - House - LAY ON TABLE (REP VAILLANCOURT) (Y: 150 N: 186 NV: 61 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - House - LAY ON TABLE (REP HUNT) (Y: 160 N: 182 NV: 55 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - House - INDEFINITELY POSTPONE (REP HOELL) (Y: 151 N: 187 NV: 59 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - House - LAY ON TABLE (REP VAILLANCOURT) (Y: 150 N: 186 NV: 61 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - House - LAY ON TABLE (REP HUNT) (Y: 160 N: 182 NV: 55 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | Senate | Not Introduced (Rule 3-26) |
2013-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 189-139; House Journal 27, PG.897-899 |
2013-03-20 | House | Recommit (Rep Lambert): Motion Failed Division Vote 65-263; House Journal 27, PG.897 |
2013-03-20 | House | Indefinitely Postpone (Rep Hoell): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 151-187; House Journal 27, PG.895-897 |
2013-03-20 | House | Lay on Table (Rep Vaillancourt): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 150-186; House Journal 27, PG.893-895 |
2013-03-20 | House | Indefinitely Postpone (Rep Hoell); House Journal 27, PG.893 |
2013-03-20 | House | Lay on Table (Rep Hunt): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 160-182; House Journal 27, PG.890-893 |
2013-03-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 23 PG.597-598 |
2013-03-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 20 (Vote 9-8; Part II, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 23 PG.597-598 |
2013-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 2/21/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-02-05 | House | ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 2/14/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 ==ROOM CHANGE (Orig Legislative Office Building 203)== |
2013-01-31 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/7/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 1/31/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 ==RECESSED== |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.189 |