NH HCR13 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Returned to the House, Pursuant to Rule 3-26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Returned to the House, Pursuant to Rule 3-26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Condemning hate crimes and any other form of racism in New Hampshire.
Title
Condemning hate crimes and any other form of racism in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - House - OTP (Y: 234 N: 69 NV: 51 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Table (Y: 132 N: 191 NV: 31 Abs: 37) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - House - Table (Y: 132 N: 191 NV: 31 Abs: 37) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Returned to the House, Pursuant to Rule 3-26 |
2018-02-15 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 234-69 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 34 |
2018-02-15 | House | Lay House CalendarR 13 on Table (Rep. McConnell): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 132-191 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 32 |
2018-02-09 | House | Special Order to 2/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 3 P. 81 |
2018-01-31 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2018-01-31 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/07/2018 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) |
2018-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 01/16/2018 Legislative Office Building 204 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-11-09 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 25 |