NH HCR10 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to grant states broader authority to set higher environmental standards than those established in federal law.
Title
Urging Congress to grant states broader authority to set higher environmental standards than those established in federal law.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Backus [D] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Suzanne Smith [D] | Rep. David Danielson [R] |
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-03-13 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted DV 237-43 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 198 |
2020-02-27 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-02-27 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 74 |
2020-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/25/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2020-01-21 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/19/2020 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2020-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2020-01-10 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/29/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2020-01-09 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/22/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 1 P. 33 |