NH HB97 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-09 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/04/2023; Chapter 179; eff: 01/01/2024 House Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-09 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/04/2023; Chapter 179; eff: 01/01/2024 House Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an additional penalty for a violation of privacy.
Title
Establishing an additional penalty for a violation of privacy.
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Rhodes [R] | Rep. Bill Boyd [R] | Rep. Nancy Murphy [D] | Sen. Daryl Abbas [R] |
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. Debra Altschiller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-09 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 08/04/2023; Chapter 179; eff: 01/01/2024 House Journal 17 |
2023-07-19 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 House Journal 17 P. 18 |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/29/2023); Senate Journal 20 |
2023-06-15 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2023-1560s (Rep. Roy): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/15/2023 House Journal 16 P. 2 |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 06/01/2023; Senate Journal 16 |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 06/01/2023; Senate Calendar 24A |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1560s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-1560s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14 |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1560s, 05/11/2023; Senate Calendar 21 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/28/2023, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced 02/22/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 64 |
2023-01-31 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 01/27/2023 (Vote 19-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 17 |
2023-01-18 | House | Executive Session: 01/27/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2023 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |