NH HB97 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB97
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Summary
Modifying the dates of the state primary and associated filing deadline.
Title
Modifying the dates of the state primary and associated filing deadline.
Sponsors
Rep. Ralph Boehm [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-03 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB97 11/03/2021 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 8 |
2021-09-22 | House | Executive Session: 10/06/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2021-03-11 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Executive Session: 03/05/2021 12:00 pm Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/99327579520 |
2021-03-03 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/10/2021 10:10 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/95087806399 (if necessary) |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93706238627 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day ( time permitting) fromthe time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Election Law House Journal 2 P. 35 |
Same As/Similar To
HB97 (Carry Over) 2021-09-22 - Executive Session: 10/06/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=107&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB97 |