NH HB97 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the use of drones.
Title
Relative to the use of drones.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Paul Berch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/11/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Hearing: 04/12/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 18 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 16 |
2017-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/08/2017 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 8 |
2017-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 02/22/2017 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 37 |
2017-02-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0296h: Motion Adopted DV 317-37 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 37 |
2017-02-15 | House | Amendment #2017-0296h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 37 |
2017-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0296h for 02/15/2017 (Vote 15-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 20 |
2017-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-02-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/08/2017 10:20 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/02/2017 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-01-26 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2016-12-21 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 16 |