NH HB96 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB96
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-24 - Executive Session: 10/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-24 - Executive Session: 10/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the price of Lucky 7 tickets.
Title
Relative to the price of Lucky 7 tickets.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-24 | House | Executive Session: 10/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building202 |
2018-09-05 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2018 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-01-03 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 46 |
2017-10-27 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-12 | House | Executive Session: 10/25/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-08-09 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-28 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2017 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-15 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/22/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-08 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-02 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/15/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/26/2017 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2017 11:20 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-12-21 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 2 P. 16 |
Same As/Similar To
HB96 (Carry Over) 2017-10-27 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar)