NH HB96 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-19 - House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 301-303 (If Necessary Continued 10/27/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-19 - House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 301-303 (If Necessary Continued 10/27/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to issuance of individual health insurance policies by health carriers.
Title
Relative to issuance of individual health insurance policies by health carriers.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hunt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-19 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 301-303 (If Necessary Continued 10/27/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302) | |
2011-08-23 | House Retained Bill - Insurance/Consumer Div Subcom Work Session: 10/11/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-03-09 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.822 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 3/1/2011 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-02-16 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/25/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-02-03 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/17/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-27 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/3/2011 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-18 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/27/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-05 | House Public Hearing: 1/13/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 Insurance/Consumer Regulation Div | |
2010-12-30 | House Introduced 1/5/2011 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 8, PG.130 |