NH HB95 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study how taxpayer funds appropriated to the university system of New Hampshire and the community college system of New Hampshire are expended and the procedures to ensure accountability for such expenditures.
Title
Establishing a committee to study how taxpayer funds appropriated to the university system of New Hampshire and the community college system of New Hampshire are expended and the procedures to ensure accountability for such expenditures.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Chandler [R] | Rep. Richard Barry [R] | Rep. David Danielson [R] | Rep. John Hunt [R] |
Rep. Frank Byron [R] | Rep. Yvonne Dean-Bailey [R] | Rep. John Sytek [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 04/20/2017; Senate Calendar 19 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Special Order HB 95 to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/06/2017; Senate Journal 13 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Special Order HB 95 to after the bill removed from the Consent Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/06/2017; Senate Journal 13 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Special Order HB 95 to the end of the Regular Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/06/2017; Senate Journal 13 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 04/06/2017; Senate Calendar 17 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/28/2017, Room 103, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0544h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 38 |
2017-03-08 | House | Amendment #2017-0544h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 38 |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0544h (NT) for 03/08/2017 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 17 |
2017-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2017-01-04 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2016-12-21 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 2 P. 16 |