NH HB95 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - House Signed by Governor 05/09/2011; Effective 07/08/2011; Chapter 0039
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - House Signed by Governor 05/09/2011; Effective 07/08/2011; Chapter 0039
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting an insurer to operate a health maintenance organization as a line of business.
Title
Permitting an insurer to operate a health maintenance organization as a line of business.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hunt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | House Signed by Governor 05/09/2011; Effective 07/08/2011; Chapter 0039 | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 15, Pg.293 | |
2011-04-27 | House Enrolled; House Journal 40, PG.1386 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 12, Pg.254 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12, Pg.245 | |
2011-04-06 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/13/11; Senate Calendar 19 | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Hearing: 4/6/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 18 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 10, Pg.169 | |
2011-02-09 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.309 | |
2011-02-03 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 9 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 12, PG.200 | |
2011-01-26 | House Executive Session: 2/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-05 | House Public Hearing: 1/13/2011 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 Insurance/Consumer Regulation Div | |
2010-12-30 | House Introduced 1/5/2011 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 8, PG.130 |