NH HB92 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB92
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-15 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2490h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-15 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2490h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the state building code and ratifying changes to the state building code adopted by the state building code review board.
Title
Revising the definition of the state building code and ratifying changes to the state building code adopted by the state building code review board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2490h |
2017-11-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 10-7; Regular Calendar) |
2017-10-03 | House | Executive Session: 11/01/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-10-03 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/11/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-09-27 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/03/2017 09:15 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-08-16 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 08/22/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-03-02 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-02-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/23/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2016-12-21 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 16 |
Same As/Similar To
HB92 (Carry Over) 2017-11-15 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2490h