NH HB88 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 04/13/2023; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 04/13/2023; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to reproductive rights.
Title
Relative to reproductive rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-13 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 04/13/2023; Senate Journal 13 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Special Order to the beginning of the Regular Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/13/2023; Senate Journal 13 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 04/13/2023; Senate Calendar 17A |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Hearing: 04/06/2023, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Introduced 03/23/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 199-185 03/23/2023 House Journal 11 P. 25 |
2023-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 03/08/2023 (Vote ; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 36 |
2023-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-24 | House | Public Hearing: 02/15/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Judiciary |