NH HB86 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-22 - Executive Session: 10/06/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
Pending: House Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to voter qualifications and registration procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to voter qualifications and registration procedures.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-22HouseExecutive Session: 10/06/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
2021-02-18HouseRetained in Committee
2021-02-17HouseExecutive Session: 02/17/2021 09:30 am Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/95842759377
2021-01-15HousePublic Hearing: 01/22/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following links:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91927250837Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout theday time permitting from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-13HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Election Law House Journal 2 P. 55

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback