NH HB82 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB82
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-07 - Full Committee Work Session: 06/23/2023 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
Pending: House Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-07 - Full Committee Work Session: 06/23/2023 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
Pending: House Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to employment protection for participants in the therapeutic cannabis program.
Title
Relative to employment protection for participants in the therapeutic cannabis program.
Sponsors
Rep. Suzanne Vail [D] | Rep. Gaby Grossman [D] | Rep. Wendy Thomas [D] | Rep. Jodi Newell [D] |
Rep. Christine Seibert [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/23/2023 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-03-16 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-03-03 | House | Executive Session: 03/15/2023 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-02-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/02/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2023-02-09 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/16/2023 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2023 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |
Same As/Similar To
HB82 (Carry Over) 2023-06-07 - Full Committee Work Session: 06/23/2023 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 305-307