NH HB731 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB731

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-28 - Vetoed by Governor Sununu 07/24/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the state minimum hourly rate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the state minimum hourly rate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-01 - House - Concur (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 351 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - House - OTPA (Y: 212 N: 155 NV: 3 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 189 N: 177 NV: 4 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 189 N: 170 NV: 11 Abs: 26) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-28HouseVetoed by Governor Sununu 07/24/2020
2020-07-10HouseEnrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10
2020-07-10SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9
2020-06-30HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Sullivan): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 199-124 06/30/2020
2020-06-16SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-1464s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-16SenateCommittee Amendment # 2020-1464s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1464s, 06/16/2020; Senate Calendar 23
2020-06-05SenateThe following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3043). Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCjBZdtrjRnQdmg-2MPMiWrA Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate5. Webinar ID: 940 7264 6718 Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate4. Or iPhone one-tap: 13017158592,,94072646718# or 13126266799,,94072646718# Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate3. To listen via telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): 1-301-715-8592, or 1-312-626-6799 or 1-929-205-6099, or 1-253-215-8782, or 1-346-248-7799, or 1-669-900-6833 Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate2. To submit your testimony to the committee, please send all documents via email to remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate1. To sign-in and/or speak in support or opposition, please register in advance by using this link: https://www.zoom.us/webinar/register/WN_croAzCD-TXuZDPa4hQt2XQ Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateMembers of the public may attend using the following links: Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateCommittee members will receive secure Zoom invitations via email. Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateRemote Hearing: 06/11/2020, 10:05 am, on proposed amendment # 2020-1342s; Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateRemote Hearing: 06/11/2020, 10:05 am, on proposed amendment # 2020-1342s; Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateRemote Hearing: 06/11/2020, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 22
2020-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 7
2020-01-09HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2767h (NT)/2019-2897h/2020-0024h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 212-155 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 2
2020-01-09HouseFLAM # 2020-0024h (Rep. Schultz): Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 189-177 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 2
2020-01-09HouseFLAM # 2019-2897h (Rep. Kanzler): Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 189-170 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 2
2020-01-09HouseAmendment # 2019-2767h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 2
2019-11-08HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-11-08HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2767h (NT) (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 26
2019-10-30HouseExecutive Session: 11/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-10-09HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-03-12HouseRetained in Committee
2019-02-26HouseExecutive Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-02-21HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/26/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308
2019-02-12HousePublic Hearing: 02/20/2019 01:10 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 3 P. 28

Same As/Similar To

HB731 (Carry Over) 2019-11-08 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=761&sy=2020&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB731
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&id=808&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=808
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=808
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=18&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB0731&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB731&ddlsponsors=&lsr=761
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=19&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB0731&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB731&ddlsponsors=&lsr=761
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=20&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB0731&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB731&ddlsponsors=&lsr=761
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=66&sy=2020&lb=S&eb=HB0731&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB731&ddlsponsors=&lsr=761
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=199&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB0731&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB731&ddlsponsors=&lsr=761

Bill Comments

feedback