NH HB721 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Subcommittee Work Session: 09/11/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 207
Hearing: Sep 11 @ 11:30 am in Legislative Office Building 207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to special education in towns with no public schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to special education in towns with no public schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/11/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-02-13HouseRetained in Committee
2019-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 02/12/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-01-30HousePublic Hearing: 02/06/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 207
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 27

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback