NH HB715 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
Pending: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to electrical energy storage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to electrical energy storage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - House - OTPA (Y: 214 N: 133 NV: 23 Abs: 30) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-09SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/15/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22
2019-04-24SenateHearing: 04/30/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 20
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-20HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0742h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 214-133 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 43
2019-03-20HouseAmendment # 2019-0742h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 43
2019-03-14HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-03-14HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0742h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 35
2019-03-06HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/13/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-03-06House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-02-27House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/06/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-02-27HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-02-06HousePublic Hearing: 02/13/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 304
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 27

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback