NH HB712 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB712
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2786h (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2786h (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a family and medical leave insurance program.
Title
Relative to a family and medical leave insurance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - OTPA (Y: 199 N: 133 NV: 37 Abs: 31) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2786h (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 11/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-10-02 | House | Division I Work Session: 10/22/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2019-03-27 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-03-07 | House | Finance Division I Work Session: 03/13/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2019-02-28 | House | Finance Division I Work Session: 03/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Finance 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 99 |
2019-02-27 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0418h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 199-133 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 95 |
2019-02-27 | House | Amendment # 2019-0418h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 95 |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-02-20 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0418h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 21 |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 3 P. 27 |
Same As/Similar To
HB712 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2786h (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar)